EP1256502 - Protection against accident and fire for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Käufer, Rolf Scharpenhang 4 45257 Essen / DE | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/46] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010109.3 | 08.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | DE20011022183 | 08.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10122183 | [2002/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256502 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256502 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256502 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B61K9/04, B61K9/12 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B61K9/12 (EP);
B61K9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/34] |
Former [2004/30] | |||
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Unfall-/Brandschutz bei Fahrzeugen | [2002/46] | English: | Protection against accident and fire for vehicles | [2002/46] | French: | Protection contre les accidents et les incendies pour véhicules | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 11.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.06.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | 04.06.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.06.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   18.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | FR | 05.04.2006 | GB | 05.04.2006 | IE | 05.04.2006 | IT | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | TR | 05.04.2006 | LU | 08.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | ES | 16.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | DE | 01.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
FR | 05.04.2006 | ||
GB | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
LU | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
GB | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
LU | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
FR | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
GB | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
LU | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
GB | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
GB | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
GB | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
GB | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 05.07.2006 | |
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19826422 (WOOP BERND [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 41; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,5,8; | [XA]DE19826220 (DIEBEL TAMAS [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 18; figure 1 * [A] 2; | [A]DE19830685 (GAERTNER DIETER H [DE]) [A] 1,2,6* the whole document *; | [XA]DE19911848 (KUEHN ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 40 - column 7, line 59; figures 1-6 * [A] 2,4,5,8 |