Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258264

EP1258264 - Aerosol delivery apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Activaero GmbH
Wohraer Strasse 37
35285 Gemünden / DE
[2006/21]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
InAMed GmbH
Wohraer Strasse 37
35285 Gemünden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Scheuch, Gerhard, Dr.
Taunusstrasse 12
35285 Gemünden / DE
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/47]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02010211.715.05.2002
[2002/47]
Priority number, dateDE200112374916.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10123749
[2002/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1258264
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1258264
Date:31.03.2004
[2004/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258264
Date:26.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61M15/00, A61M11/00
[2004/14]
Former International [2002/47]A61M15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Verabreichen von Aerosolen[2002/47]
English:Aerosol delivery apparatus[2002/47]
French:Appareil pour l'administration d'aérosol[2002/47]
Examination procedure03.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/45]
30.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2007Fee for grant paid
06.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.12.2007
DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
TR26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
AT15.05.2008
LU15.05.2008
PT26.05.2008
BE31.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
IT31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]CY26.12.2007
DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
TR26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
AT15.05.2008
LU15.05.2008
PT26.05.2008
BE31.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2010/32]CY26.12.2007
DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
AT15.05.2008
LU15.05.2008
PT26.05.2008
BE31.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/40]CY26.12.2007
DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
AT15.05.2008
PT26.05.2008
BE31.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/33]CY26.12.2007
DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
BE31.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/19]DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
BE31.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/12]DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
CH31.05.2008
LI31.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2009/04]DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
MC31.05.2008
Former [2008/48]DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
IE26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
Former [2008/46]DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
Former [2008/42]FI26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
Former [2008/35]FI26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
Former [2008/27]FI26.12.2007
NL26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
Former [2008/25]FI26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
Former [2008/23]SE26.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0580517  (TAEMA [FR]) [X] 1,4-7 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 14 *;
 [X]US6167880  (GONDA IGOR [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * column 19, line 36 - column 20, line 41 * * column 24, line 17 - column 25, line 20 * * column 27, line 63 - column 29, line 37 * * column 42, line 7 - line 30 * * figure 4 *;
 [X]WO0058022  (LIPOSOL LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 33; figure - *;
 [X]US5156776  (LOEDDING HUBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 6, line 66 - column 8, line 22 *;
 [PX]DE10013093  (INAMED GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,4-7 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] *
ExaminationEP1136093