Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1265146

EP1265146 - Debugging method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2007Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2007  [2007/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2002/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Henftling, Renate
Fliederstrasse 13
82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE
02 / Ecker, Wolfgang, Dr.
Mäuselweg 20
81375 München / DE
03 / Zinn, Andreas
Christoph-Von-Gluck-Platz 21
80807 München / DE
04 / Bauer, Matthias, Dr.
Alois-Eberl-Strasse 22
83624 Otterfing / DE
05 / Zambaldi, Martin
Therese-Giehse-Allee 62
81739 München / DE
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Banzer, Hans-Jörg , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date02010295.021.05.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateDE200112717005.06.2001         Original published format: DE 10127170
[2002/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1265146
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1265146
Date:12.04.2006
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/36
[2002/50]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2006/51]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fehlersuchverfahren und Fehlersuchvorrichtung[2002/50]
English:Debugging method and system[2002/50]
French:Procédé et dispositif de déboggage[2002/50]
Examination procedure13.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/27]
01.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/28]
09.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.11.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.11.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.11.2006M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6026230  (LIN SHARON SHEAU-PYNG [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column A * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 19 * * column 3, line 55 - column 6, line 56 * * column 12, line 5 - column 12, line 63 * * column 16, line 44 - column 18, line 61 * * column 21, line 40 - column 22, line 19 *;
 [X]WO9120032  (SUPERCOMPUTER SYSTEMS LTD [US]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5768567  (KLEIN RUSSELL [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column W *;
 [A]WO9855879  (VERISITY LTD [IL]) [A] 1-19 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 28 * * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 15 *;
 [A]WO0025240  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 6, line 12 - page 9, line 10 *