Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258846

EP1258846 - Segmented Fresnel lens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 04.07.2007  [2007/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vimar SpA
Viale Vicenza 14
36063 Marostica (VI) / IT
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Gusi, Piero Camillo
Via Panica 1
36063 Marostica / IT
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Petruzziello, Aldo
Racheli S.r.l.
Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Petruzziello, Aldo
Racheli & C. S p A Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date02010315.607.05.2002
[2002/47]
Priority number, dateIT2001MI0102417.05.2001         Original published format: IT MI20011024
[2002/47]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1258846
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1258846
Date:21.05.2003
[2003/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258846
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/193
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesAL15.10.2003
LT15.10.2003
LV15.10.2003
MK15.10.2003
RO15.10.2003
SI15.10.2003
TitleGerman:Segmentierte Fresnel-Linse[2002/47]
English:Segmented Fresnel lens[2002/47]
French:Lentille de Fresnel segmentée[2002/47]
Examination procedure15.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/50]
25.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2004Fee for grant paid
21.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
CY07.05.2005
IE09.05.2005
MC31.05.2005
[2007/27]
Former [2007/20]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
CY07.05.2005
IE09.05.2005
Former [2007/10]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
SE08.03.2005
IE09.05.2005
Former [2006/25]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
IE09.05.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
DK08.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT08.12.2004
BE08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
Former [2005/36]AT08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI08.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0484293  (TEKNOX SRL [IT]) [AD] 1-10 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 38; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5442178  (BALDWIN JOHN R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *