Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256707

EP1256707 - Fuel filter with water release means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Filtersysteme GmbH
Pragstrasse 54
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Dittmann, Jörg
Äxtlestrasse 17
70599 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Gänswein, Matthias
Kolpingstrasse 47
73732 Esslingen / DE
03 / Lang, Hans-Peter
Pfarrstrasse 5
70734 Fellbach / DE
04 / Metz, Frank
Hasenäckstrasse 84/1
71397 Leutenbach / DE
05 / Schick, Albert
Mühlstrasse 6/3
74336 Brackenheim / DE
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Bongen, Renaud & Partner
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2002/46]Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft, Rotermund + Pfusch + Bernard
Waiblinger Strasse 11
70372 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02010425.308.05.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateDE200112319012.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10123190
[2002/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256707
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256707
Date:05.11.2003
[2003/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:F02M37/22, B01D36/00
[2003/45]
Former International [2002/46]F02M37/22
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/31]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kraftstofffilter mit wasserabscheidenden Mitteln[2002/46]
English:Fuel filter with water release means[2002/46]
French:Filtre de carburant avec moyen de separation d'eau[2002/46]
Examination procedure07.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/11]
01.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.07.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.07.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3187895  (PALL DAVID B, et al) [X] 1-4 * figure - * * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 59 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 45 * * column 6, line 18 - line 43 * * column 7, line 44 - line L *;
 [XA]US4372847  (LEWIS ANDREW D) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 41 * * column 6, line 41 - column 9, line 7 * [A] 4;
 [XA]US3199676  (MAY CLIFFORD H) [X] 1,2,4 * figure - * * column 1, line 9 - line 25 * * column 1, line L - column 2, line L * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 28 * [A] 3;
 [A]JPS6411609  ;
 [A]US5149433  (LIEN LARRY A [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 3 * * column 6, line 37 - line 63 *;
 [A]EP0301139  (BOWSER FILTRATION LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 8 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890427), vol. 013, no. 182, Database accession no. (C - 591), [A] 1-4 * abstract *
by applicantEP0356832