Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258258

EP1258258 - Implantable device comprising a stent and angiotensin II receptor antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugimoto, Ryota
Terumo K.K., 1500, Inokuchi, Nakai-machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02010498.008.05.2002
[2002/47]
Priority number, dateJP2001013696608.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001136966
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258258
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61L31/16, A61L31/14
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
TitleGerman:Implantierbare Vorrichtungen mit Stent und Angiotensin II Rezeptor-Antagonisten[2002/47]
English:Implantable device comprising a stent and angiotensin II receptor antagonists[2002/47]
French:Dispositifs implantables comprenant un stent et des antagonistes aux récepteurs de l'angiotensine II[2002/47]
Examination procedure28.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
14.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/16]
16.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5697967  (DINH THOMAS Q [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO0004862  ;
 [Y]US5342348  (KAPLAN AARON V [US]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [Y]US6211217  (SPINALE FRANCIS G [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2270841  (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2783422  (SANOFI SA [FR]) [A] 1-7 * page 1 - page 3; claims 1,10 *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 21, Database accession no. 2000-246290, XP002208839 & WO0004862 A 20000203 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *