Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256423

EP1256423 - Device for accomodating a retractable slicing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.06.2006  [2006/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steinke, Werner
Chiemseestrasse 11
83101 Lauterbach / DE
[2005/02]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Riedler, Alexander
Fasanenstrasse 18
83101 Rohrdorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Werner, Steinke
Am Kirchberg 2
83083 Riedering / DE
02 / Holzner, Ralf
Adalberogasse 15
85560 Ebersberg / DE
 [2002/46]
Application number, filing date02010530.010.05.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateDE200112288111.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10122881
[2002/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256423
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256423
Date:23.07.2003
[2003/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:B26D7/00
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
TitleGerman:Aufnahmevorrichtung für eine herausklappbare Alleschneidmaschine[2002/46]
English:Device for accomodating a retractable slicing machine[2002/46]
French:Dispositif pour accueillir une machine à débiter en tranches escamotable[2002/46]
Examination procedure17.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/09]
26.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
02.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
13.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200403   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE20002293U  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-9,14,15 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]DE4403185  (RITTERWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 64 - line 68 *;
 [DX]DE19546968  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [DX] 1-9,14,15 * column 1, line 35 - line 36 *;
 [X]DE19543828  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-9,14,15 * column 2, line 25 - line 31 * * column 3, line 5 - line 30 *
by applicantDE1893254U
 DE19543829
 DE19545968