Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1361374

EP1361374 - Clutch device for motor vehicle or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills MI 48326 / US
Former [2003/46]For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
3001 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 200
Troy, Michigan 48007-5060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Thomas
Markstrasse 63
76829 Landau / DE
 [2003/46]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date02010541.710.05.2002
[2003/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1361374
Date:12.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1361374
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16D25/0638, F16D25/12
[2003/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/32]
Former [2003/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kupplungseinrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeug oder dergleichen[2003/46]
English:Clutch device for motor vehicle or the like[2003/46]
French:Système d'embrayage pour véhicule automobile ou similaire[2003/46]
Examination procedure13.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
13.05.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.09.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
26.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.2008Fee for grant paid
24.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.06.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT18.02.2009
[2011/14]
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH04191530  ;
 [A]EP1079130  (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [A] 4,8,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 44 - line 47 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5267807  (BIEDERMANN SIEGHART [DE], et al) [A] 5-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 8 - line 37 * * figures 1-5 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921026), vol. 016, no. 519, Database accession no. (M - 1330), [X] 1-3,5,7,9 * abstract *