EP1260363 - Regulating method for the operation of individually driven rotary machine elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agne, Werner Himmelgarten 21 90552 Röthenbach / DE | [2002/48] | Application number, filing date | 02010666.2 | 13.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | DE2001125609 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10125609 | [2002/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260363 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260363 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/004 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
B41F13/0045 (EP,US);
B41P2213/734 (EP,US);
B65H2557/264 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/33] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Regelungsverfahren zum Betrieb von einzeln angetriebenen rotierenden Maschinenelementen | [2002/48] | English: | Regulating method for the operation of individually driven rotary machine elements | [2002/48] | French: | Procédé pour le fonctionnement des composants de machines rotatifs entraînés individuellement | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 05.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4322744 (BAUMUELLER NUERNBERG GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9711848 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1,4,5 * abstract * |