Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260900

EP1260900 - Method for counting key operations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sourcenext Corporation
6-10-1 Roppongi, Minato-ku
Tokyo 106-6115 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
SOURCENEXT CORPORATION
1-3-3 Shinkawa, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0033 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujimoto, Kousuke, c/o Sourcenext Corp.
1-3-3 Shinkawa, Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-0033 / JP
02 / Imazeki, Riichi, Sourcenext Corp.
1-3-3 Shinkawa, Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-0033 / JP
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02010770.214.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateJP2001014736117.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001147361
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260900
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260900
Date:01.02.2006
[2006/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/023, G09B13/00
[2006/05]
Former International [2002/48]G06F3/023
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2006/40]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Zählen von Tastenoperationen[2002/48]
English:Method for counting key operations[2002/48]
French:Procédé de comptage des actionnements de clés[2002/48]
Examination procedure02.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/18]
05.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.09.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.09.2006M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0768105  (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 19, line 1 - line 8 *;
 [A]GB2346585  (SLADDEN JENNIFER ELSPETH [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 33 * * column 11, line 7 - line 35 * * figures 11,12 *;
 [A]  FUJII H ET AL, "Features and a model for icon morphological transformation", VISUAL LANGUAGES, 1991., PROCEEDINGS. 1991 IEEE WORKSHOP ON KOBE, JAPAN 8-11 OCT. 1991, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19911008), ISBN 0-8186-2330-6, pages 240 - 245, XP010025708 [A] 1-12 * page 240 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WVL.1991.238826