EP1258570 - Dual-purpose feed device for lavatory flush tanks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALSIR S.p.A. Località Merlaro, 2 25078 Vestone (BS) / IT | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varotti, Mario Via Mocenigo, 100 25078 VESTONE / IT | 02 /
Ferreira, Francisco Località Merlaro, 2 25078 VESTONE / IT | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2002/47] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al c/o Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02010839.5 | 15.05.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI01006 | 16.05.2001 Original published format: IT MI20011006 | [2002/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1258570 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1258570 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E03D3/02 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
F16K21/18 (EP);
E03D1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Title | German: | Doppelfunktionzuführvorrichting für Toilettenspülkästen | [2002/47] | English: | Dual-purpose feed device for lavatory flush tanks | [2002/47] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation à double fonction pour réservoirs de chasse d'eau | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/24] | 24.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2868492 (VITTORIO VOLCOV, et al) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]AU1991576 (BRANDELLI A R) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |