blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1262317 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1262317



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 881
09.02.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
09.02.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Description Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
25.01.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 5
25.01.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 5
25.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.10.2016 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
18.10.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
18.10.2016 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
18.10.2016 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 22
12.10.2016 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.08.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
02.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.08.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.08.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.08.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 6
02.06.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
02.06.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
02.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Claims Appeal 4
27.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
27.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
24.05.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
23.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 17
17.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 17
13.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 18
13.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 18
13.05.2016 General authorisation Appeal 1
13.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.05.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.01.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.01.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 1
20.01.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
18.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.12.2015 General enquiry Appeal 1
23.10.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.01.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
21.01.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
20.01.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 4
13.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.10.2014 General enquiry Appeal 1
13.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.06.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
28.02.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.02.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
26.02.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
29.10.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
17.10.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
04.10.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
04.10.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 44
04.10.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 42
14.08.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
08.08.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.08.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
31.05.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
31.05.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
31.05.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 15
31.05.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.04.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Claims Opposition 4
19.03.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
18.03.2013 Claims Opposition 4
18.03.2013 Claims Opposition 4
18.03.2013 Claims Opposition 3
18.03.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
18.03.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
25.01.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
31.12.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 34
22.11.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.10.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.10.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
19.10.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.10.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.10.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2008 Claims Opposition 4
15.05.2008 Claims Opposition 4
15.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.05.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
26.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.03.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.02.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.01.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.11.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.11.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
02.10.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 50
07.12.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.11.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.11.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
22.11.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.10.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.10.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 39
14.08.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.08.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.08.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.08.2006 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
14.08.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
11.03.2003 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.12.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.10.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
07.08.2002 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
01.08.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
22.05.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.05.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
22.05.2002 Description Search / examination 26
22.05.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.05.2002 Drawings Search / examination 10
22.05.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6