Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260718

EP1260718 - Building element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fitz, Johannes
Gewerbering 7
83370 Seeon / DE
For all designated states
Schiewe, Rolf
Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 23
63128 Dietzenbach / DE
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Fitz, Johannes
Gewerbering 7
83370 Seeon / DE
02 / Zegenhagen, Walter-B.
In den Speyergärten 4
63128 Dietzenbach / DE
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn
haarpatent
Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer
Goethestraße 2
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Karlstrasse 23 (Haus Otto)
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
Application number, filing date02011313.023.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateDE2001208739U23.05.2001         Original published format: DE 20108739 U
[2002/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260718
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260718
Date:09.07.2003
[2003/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260718
Date:09.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16B5/06
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:Bauelement[2002/48]
English:Building element[2002/48]
French:Elément de construction[2002/48]
Examination procedure12.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/09]
21.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2005Fee for grant paid
10.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
FR09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
TR09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
LU23.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/37]FI09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
TR09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
LU23.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
Former [2007/45]FI09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
BE31.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
Former [2007/37]FI09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
IT09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
BE31.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
Former [2007/28]FI09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
BE31.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
Former [2007/07]FI09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
MC31.05.2006
Former [2006/48]FI09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2006/40]FI09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/38]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/35]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/33]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/23]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2637631  (CHENEL GUY [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 4, line 16 - page 6, column 1; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3,8;
 [X]US5448863  (ZAPF OTTO W [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US6148488  (GRISTOCK RICK ALAN [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract *;
 [YA]GB1037236  (COVENTRY MOTOR AND SUNDRIES CO) [Y] 8 * page 2, line 10 - line 13 * * page 2, line 47 - line 59; figures 4,5,7 * [A] 3,6