Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260717

EP1260717 - Arrangement for attaching two members to each other [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2010
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.11.2010  [2010/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD.
101-2 Yagotohonmachi, Showa-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[2009/49]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO CO., LTD.
101-2 Yagotohonmachi, Showa-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Goto, Mitsushige
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Ito, Shuji
c/o Aoyama Seisakusho Co.,Ltd., 8, Takahashi 1-chome
Oguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi / JP
03 / Ozawa, Junzo
c/o Aoyama Seisakusho Co.,Ltd., 8, Takahashi 1-chome
Oguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi / JP
 [2009/49]
Former [2002/48]01 / Goto, Mitsushige
K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Ito, Shuji
Aoyama Seisakusho Co.,Ltd., 8, Takahashi 1-chome
Oguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi / JP
03 / Ozawa, Junzo
Aoyama Seisakusho Co.,Ltd., 8, Takahashi 1-chome
Oguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi / JP
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date02011365.023.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateJP2001015393923.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001153939
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260717
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260717
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16B5/02
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/33]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anordnung zum gegenseitigen Verbinden zweier Elemente[2002/48]
English:Arrangement for attaching two members to each other[2002/48]
French:Arrangement d'assemblage de deux éléments entre eux[2002/48]
Examination procedure04.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/05]
07.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2009Fee for grant paid
21.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO0210595  (AOYAMA SEISAKUSHO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH10236336  ;
 [A]US4043239  (DEFUSCO ERNEST L) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, [A] 1 * abstract *