Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264557

EP1264557 - Knitted-in slide fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2007
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YKK Corporation
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/40]For all designated states
YKK Corporation
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
YKK CORPORATION
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsuda, Yoshio
1898, Uwano, Nyuzen-machi
Shimoniikawa-gun, Toyama-ken / JP
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
[2008/41]
Former [2002/50]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7, II Aufgang
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date02011366.823.05.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateJP2001017452108.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001174521
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1264557
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1264557
Date:04.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:A44B19/34
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/36]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Eingewirkter Reissverschluss[2002/50]
English:Knitted-in slide fastener[2002/50]
French:Fermeture à glissière tricotée[2002/50]
Examination procedure02.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
30.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2006Fee for grant paid
27.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2008/04]
Former [2007/37]IT04.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0925736  (YKK CORP [JP]);
 JPH11187909  [ ] (YKK CORP);
 [A]EP1048238  (YKK CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP0399708  (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]);
 [A]US5688594  (LICHSCHEIDT BENT [DK], et al)