blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1279457

EP1279457 - Manufacturing method of sealing elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.11.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG
Eschenweg 11
15827 Dahlewitz / DE
[2005/24]
Former [2003/05]For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Deutschland GmbH
Eschenweg 11
15827 Dahlewitz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schreiber, Karl
Luckenwalderstrasse 31
15806 Mellensee / DE
02 / Goebel, Matthias
Rhinstrasse 18
12307 Berlin / DE
03 / Reuter, Stefan
Bergmannstrasse 31
10961 Berlin / DE
 [2003/05]
Representative(s)Weber, Joachim
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/05]Weber, Joachim, Dr.
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date02011475.724.05.2002
[2003/05]
Priority number, dateDE200113597424.07.2001         Original published format: DE 10135974
[2003/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1279457
Date:29.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1279457
Date:04.02.2004
[2004/06]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1279457
Date:22.06.2005
[2005/25]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1279457
Date:07.09.2005
[2005/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1279457
Date:24.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:B23K1/00, F01D11/12
[2004/06]
CPC:
B23K1/0014 (EP,US); F28D19/047 (EP,US); B23K2103/10 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/05]B23K1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/51]
Former [2004/44](deleted) 
Former [2003/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Dichtungselements[2003/05]
English:Manufacturing method of sealing elements[2003/05]
French:Méthode de fabrication d'éléments d'étanchéité[2006/44]
Former [2003/05]Méthode de fabrication de joints
Examination procedure20.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
20.10.2004Request for decision received: Various
03.05.2005Result of request for decision (Various): Request rejected
13.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2006Fee for grant paid
11.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.09.2004DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.10.2004
10.09.2004FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.10.2004
10.09.2004GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.10.2004
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
10.09.2004M01   Fee paid on   20.10.2004
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]FR2258524  (ROLLS ROYCE [GB]) [X] 3,4,7,18 * the whole document * [A] 1,2;
 [XA]JPS59179265  (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) [X] 3,4,10,13 * the whole document * [A] 1;
 [A]US4869421  (NORRIS BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1,3,14* column W *;
 [XA]JPH02251364  (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3,4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.