Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1261032

EP1261032 - Semiconductor switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.10.2009
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP
[2009/37]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Asano, Tetsuro
106-27, Furugori, Oizumi-machi
Ora-gun, Gunma-Ken / JP
02 / Hirai, Toshikazu
986-5, Yoshida, Oizumi-machi
Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
03 / Sakakibara, Mikito
21-1-315, Cyuo
Menuma-machi, Osata-gun, Saitama / JP
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date02011496.324.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateJP2001015671325.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001156713
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1261032
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1261032
Date:13.07.2005
[2005/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/02, H01L27/06
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE [2006/14]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Halbleiterschaltanordnung[2002/48]
English:Semiconductor switching device[2002/48]
French:Dispositif de commutation à semiconducteur[2002/48]
Examination procedure22.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/08]
14.01.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
17.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2009Fee for grant paid
23.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.08.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
22.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.02.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
22.02.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0784345  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,12 * figure 5 * [Y] 3;
 [X]EP0625831  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,12 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO0074144  (UNIV ARIZONA [US], et al) [Y] 3 * figure 4 *
 [X]  SCHINDLER M J ET AL, A high power 2-18 GHz T/R switch, PAGE(S) 119-122, XP010006386 [X] 1,2,5,7,9,12 * figure 1 *
ExaminationUS5812939