Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1262178

EP1262178 - Suppressor of anemia and appetite suppressor comprising threonine alone or in combination with methionine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2012  [2012/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawamata, Yasuko
c/o Ajinomoto Co.Inc, 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Kimura, Takeshi
c/o Ajinomoto Co.Inc, 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Miura, Makoto
c/o Ajinomoto Co.Inc, 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Toue, Sakino
c/o Ajinomoto Co.Inc, 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
05 / Sakai, Ryousei
c/o Ajinomoto Co.Inc, 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
 [2002/49]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2002/49]
Application number, filing date02011873.328.05.2002
[2002/49]
Priority number, dateJP2001016524231.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001165242
JP2002015091824.05.2002         Original published format: JP 2002150918
[2002/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1262178
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1262178
Date:22.01.2003
[2003/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/198, A61P3/04, A61P7/06, A23L1/305, A23K1/16
[2003/04]
Former International [2002/49]A61K31/198, A61P3/04, A61P7/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/49]
TitleGerman:Anaemia- und Appetitdämpfungsmittel das Threonin allein oder in Kombination mit Methionin enthält[2002/49]
English:Suppressor of anemia and appetite suppressor comprising threonine alone or in combination with methionine[2002/49]
French:Atténuateur d'anemie et atténuateur d'appétit comprenant de la thréonine seule ou en combinaison avec de la methionine[2002/49]
Examination procedure08.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
11.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/30]
07.02.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/30]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201110   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09157163  ;
 [X]JPH0624977  ;
 [X]US4368204  (SATO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,14,15 * claim 1 *;
 [X]FR2628298  (GIACOMETTI SERGE [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,14,15 * page 1, lines 28-31 * * table 1 * * claims 1-5 *
 [X]  - HARTER J M ET AL, "FACTORS AFFECTING METHIONINE TOXICITY AND ITS ALLEVIATION IN THE CHICK", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, EN, (1978), vol. 108, no. 7, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 1061 - 1070, XP008010138 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * tables 1,5 * * page 1063, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 1065, column R, paragraph 2 - page 1066, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 1069, column L, paragraph 4 *
 [X]  - FAU D ET AL, "EFFECT OF EXCESS DIETARY METHIONINE ON WEIGHT GAIN AND PLASMA AMINO ACIDS IN KITTENS", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1987), vol. 117, no. 11, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 1838 - 1843, XP008010732 [X] 1-5,7-9,11-15 * abstract * * page 1839, column L, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 1839, column R, paragraph 4 - page 1840, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 1841, column L, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 34, Database accession no. 1997-369377, XP002221329 & JPH09157163 A 19970617 (SASAKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-15 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 09, Database accession no. 1994-071836, XP002221330 & JPH0624977 A 19940201 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-5,7,9,11-15 * abstract *