blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1367010

EP1367010 - Parts feeder and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.08.2005  [2005/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YKK Corporation
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
YKK CORPORATION
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takase, Hiroto
8-23, Kyoudennakamachi
Uozu-shi, Toyama-ken / JP
02 / Yagi, Susumu
5505, Nyuzen, Nyuzen-machi
Shimoniikawa-gun, Toyama-ken / JP
 [2003/49]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel, et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]Casalonga, Axel, et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02011878.228.05.2002
[2003/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1367010
Date:03.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:B65G27/32, B65G27/24, G05D19/02
[2003/49]
CPC:
G05D19/02 (EP); B65G27/24 (EP); B65G27/32 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/35]
Former [2003/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zuführeinrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür[2003/49]
English:Parts feeder and control method thereof[2003/49]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation de pièces et son procédé de commande[2003/49]
Examination procedure11.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/16]
23.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/34]
22.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5477958  (BUEHREN HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 52 - line 67 * * column 6, line 23 - line 47 * * column 7, line 7 - line 13 *;
 [A]EP0699604  (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP1201572  (YKK CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] *;
 JP2002145436  [ ] (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO);
 [A]US2002066645  (NAKAMURA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0009] *
by applicantJPH0760187
 JPH1049237
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.