Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264765

EP1264765 - Electric control device for a motor-driven derailleur for bicycles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CAMPAGNOLO S.R.L.
Via della Chimica 4
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
CAMPAGNOLO S.R.L.
Via della Chimica 4
I-36100 Vicenza / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Dal Pra', Giuseppe
Via G. Verdi, 11/A
36010 Zané, (Vicenza) / IT
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Riccardi, Elisa , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A.
Via Trebbia, 20
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]Riccardi, Elisa , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino 19/2
20135 Milano / IT
Former [2002/50]Notaro, Giancarlo
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18
10123 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date02012047.331.05.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateIT2001TO0055508.06.2001         Original published format: IT TO20010555
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1264765
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1264765
Date:21.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B62M25/08, B62M25/04
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/50]
Extension statesRO20.05.2003
TitleGerman:Elektrisch gesteuerte Getriebe für die Steuerung eines Kettenräderwechselgetriebes eines Fahrrads[2002/50]
English:Electric control device for a motor-driven derailleur for bicycles[2002/50]
French:Dispositif électrique pour la commande du dérailleur motorisé d'un cycle[2002/50]
Examination procedure20.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/29]
24.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2004Fee for grant paid
19.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.07.2004
BE21.07.2004
CH21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
LI21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
TR21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
PT21.12.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2006/52]AT21.07.2004
BE21.07.2004
CH21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
LI21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
TR21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2006/23]AT21.07.2004
BE21.07.2004
CH21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
LI21.07.2004
NL21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/28]AT21.07.2004
BE21.07.2004
CH21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
LI21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT21.07.2004
CH21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
LI21.07.2004
DK21.10.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/21]AT21.07.2004
CH21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
LI21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
GR21.10.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT21.07.2004
FI21.07.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI21.07.2004
SE21.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE21.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5470277  (ROMANO ANTONIO [IT]) [DX] 1-3,23-30 * column 5, line 5 - line 30; figure 8 *;
 [X]US5653649  (WATARAI ETSUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,23-25,30 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5479776  (ROMANO ANTONIO [IT]) [A] 4-10,31-34 * column W *
by applicantUS5470277
 ITTO000540