Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264801

EP1264801 - Reduction process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.05.2009  [2009/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Feralco AB
Industrigatan 125
252 32 Helsingborg / SE
[2002/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Jäfverström, Stefan
S-dra Promenaden 113
602 34 Norrköping / SE
02 / Clarke, Neil
19 Handforth Close
Thelwall, Warrington, Cheshire, WA4 2JR / GB
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson , et al
Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson , et al
Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4
417 64 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date02012069.731.05.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateSE2001000199607.06.2001         Original published format: SE 0101996
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1264801
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1264801
Date:29.10.2003
[2003/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/58, C02F1/70
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/50]
TitleGerman:Direktreduktionsprozess[2002/50]
English:Reduction process[2002/50]
French:Processus de reduction directe[2002/50]
Examination procedure10.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/20]
04.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/22]
13.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200807   M06   Not yet paid
Stay/Interruption15.03.2005Stay of proceedings
01.04.2008Resumption of proceedings
[2008/07]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19507066  (LPW ANLAGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * example 4; claim - *;
 [A]EP0364188  (ENTHONE [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]DE3347385  (INOVAN STROEBE [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]US5069800  (MURPHY ANDREW P [US]) [A] 1,3 * claim - *