EP1281884 - Series of shafts and manufacturing method therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Sew-Eurodrive GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GMBH & CO. Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 D-76646 Bruchsal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häcker, Uwe Goethestrasse 65 76356 Weingarten / DE | [2003/06] | Application number, filing date | 02012264.4 | 04.06.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | DE2001137024 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10137024 | [2003/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1281884 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1281884 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1281884 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/072, F16D1/08 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
F16D1/072 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/06] | F16D1/072 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Title | German: | Baureihe von Wellen und Verfahren zur Fertigung | [2003/06] | English: | Series of shafts and manufacturing method therefore | [2003/06] | French: | Game d'arbres et procédé de leur fabrication | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 04.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IE | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | SE | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | ES | 22.05.2009 | AT | 04.06.2009 | LU | 04.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
AT | 04.06.2009 | ||
LU | 04.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
AT | 04.06.2009 | ||
IT | 04.06.2009 | ||
LU | 04.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
AT | 04.06.2009 | ||
IT | 04.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
AT | 04.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
AT | 04.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 11.02.2009 | |
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 11.02.2009 | |
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | ES | 22.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4886392 (IIO MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,8-10 * column 3, line 12 - line 46 * * column 5, line 3 - line 9; figure - *; | [A]DD292860 (ELEKTROMOTORENWERK DESSAU GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,13 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *; | [DA]DE4134552 (ORLOWSKI BERNHARD [DE]) [DA] 1,2,4,5,8-10,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP0482929 (BRIGGS & STRATTON CORP [US]) [A] 1* column 5, line 1 - line 10 *; | [A]EP0661474 (ALPHA GETRIEBEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * the whole document * |