Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1265254

EP1265254 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ueda, Michihito
5-16-103, Otemachi
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0078 / JP
02 / Toyoda, Kenji
3-2-13, Tezukayama-naka, Sumiyoshi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 558-0053 / JP
03 / Morita, Kiyoyuki
45-1-303, Yawata-shimizui
Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8062 / JP
04 / Ohtsuka, Takashi
2-7-2, Ueno-higashi
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0013 / JP
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02012386.506.06.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateJP2001017058306.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001170583
JP2001029379326.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001293793
JP2001033043829.10.2001         Original published format: JP 2001330438
JP2001022113123.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001221131
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1265254
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1265254
Date:28.07.2004
[2004/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G11C27/00, G06N3/063
[2003/29]
Former International [2002/50]G11C27/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/16]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Halbleiteranordnung[2002/50]
English:Semiconductor device[2002/50]
French:Dispositif à semi-conducteurs[2002/50]
Examination procedure30.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/14]
12.02.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
13.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9526570  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 19,22-25 * abstract * * figures 16-20 *;
 [DA]JPH07106528  ;
 [DA]US5498888  (OZAWA TAKANORI [JP]) [DA] 1-14,16-18 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 24 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0566739  (SHIBATA TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1-14,16-18 * page 9, line 25 - line 30 *;
 [A]EP0584844  (TOKYO INST TECH [JP]) [A] 1-14,16-18 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 52 *;
 [A]WO9630855  (SHIBATA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14,16-18,32-41;
 []US6456992  (SHIBATA TADASHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 4, line 43 - column 9, line 12 * * column 13, line 2 - line 52 * * figures 1-10,27,28 *;
 [A]US5276651  (SAKAMOTO WATARU [JP]) [A] 19-31 * column 1, line 1 - column 13, line 29 *;
 [A]US5923184  (OOMS WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 19-31 * column 1, line 1 - line 32 *;
 [A]US5220202  (ISONO YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 32-41 * column 6, line 9 - line 43 * * figure 1 *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, [DA] 1-14,16-18 * abstract *