blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1267009 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1267009



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 91
04.01.2005 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
20.09.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
04.08.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
02.07.2004 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
09.12.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.12.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.10.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.10.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.10.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
06.11.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.06.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.06.2002 Priority document Search / examination 36
11.06.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
11.06.2002 Description Search / examination 18
11.06.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2002 Drawings Search / examination 12
11.06.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6