blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1267009


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.01.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  23.02.2005  [2005/08]
26.10.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
26.10.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
13.09.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.07.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.07.2004 Definitive list of designations published on  18.08.2004  [2004/34]
25.06.2004 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
25.06.2004 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
10.10.2003 Publication of search report published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
01.11.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.12.2002  [2002/51]