blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1267009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1267009Global Dossier 26.11.2003A3
EP1267009 18.12.2002A2
Priority number Date
DE10128748 13.06.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE10128748 17.08.2006B4
DE10128748 16.01.2003A1
Priority number Date
DE10128748 13.06.2001