blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1267009

Designated contracting states(deleted) 
Examination procedure20.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/08]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.07.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.07.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200403   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:18.12.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:18.12.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:18.08.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:23.09.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE 8566
Code Expl.:-DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID
 
Event date:23.02.2005 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20040527