Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1267009

EP1267009 - Facade construction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EVG Bauprofil-System Entwicklungs- und Vermarktungsgesellschaft mbH
Nordstrasse 8
5301 Eugendorf / AT
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
EVG Bauprofil-System Entwicklungs- und Vermarktungsgesellschaft mbH
Nordstrasse 8
5301 Eugendorf / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Schulz, Harald, Dr.-Ing.
Lerchenweg 7
86381 Krumbach / DE
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date02012456.611.06.2002
[2002/51]
Priority number, dateDE200112874813.06.2001         Original published format: DE 10128748
[2002/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1267009
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1267009
Date:26.11.2003
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:E04B2/96, E06B3/54
[2002/51]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/34]
Former [2002/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fassadenkonstruktion[2002/51]
English:Facade construction[2002/51]
French:Construction de façade[2002/51]
Examination procedure27.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/08]
20.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/08]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.07.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
02.07.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0955420  (EVG BAUPROFIL SYSTEM ENTWICKLUNGS & VERMARKTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH [AT]) [X] 1-5,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0011]; figure 6; claim 1 *;
 [X]GB2078837  (PILLAR PG LTD) [X] 1,2,6-9,11,12 * page 1, line 120 - page 2, line 16; figure 2 *;
 [X]EP0692586  (RAICO BAUTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 1, columns 10-16 * * page 1, lines 26-35 * * page 4, columns 23-37; figure 6; claim 7 *;
 [X]US4648231  (LAROCHE FRANCOIS X [CA]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 30; figure - *