blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1270912

EP1270912 - Air-fuel ratio control system for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2010
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2009/32]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED
2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sato, Kenichi
162-16, Gumisawa-cho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
02 / Kubo, Kengo
8-1-114, Shirane 8-chome, Asahi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0005 / JP
03 / Nishizawa, Kimiyoshi
31-39, Kamiseya-cho, Seya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 246-0006 / JP
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02012463.211.06.2002
[2003/01]
Priority number, dateJP2001018803721.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001188037
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1270912
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1270912
Date:18.01.2006
[2006/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1270912
Date:05.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2005
ClassificationIPC:F02D41/14, F01N3/08
[2003/01]
CPC:
F02D41/0275 (EP,US); F01N3/0842 (EP,US); F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/38]
Former [2003/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Luft-Kraftstoff-Verhältnisregeleinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine[2003/01]
English:Air-fuel ratio control system for internal combustion engine[2003/01]
French:Système de régulation du rapport air-carburant pour un moteur à combustion interne[2003/01]
Examination procedure11.06.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
11.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2009Fee for grant paid
19.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0898067  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,4,10* paragraphs [0026] - [0083]; figure - *
by applicantJPH08232646
 JPH11210524
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.