Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264733

EP1264733 - External mirror for lorries [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEKRA Lang GmbH & Co. KG
Schuckertstrasse 8-20
90765 Fürth / DE
[2002/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Lang, Heinrich
Seenheimer Strasse 41
91465 Ergersheim / DE
02 / Popp, Albrecht
Mühlleite 22
91629 Weihenzell / DE
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date02012512.604.06.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateDE200112788608.06.2001         Original published format: DE 10127886
[2002/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1264733
Date:11.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/00, B60R1/10
[2002/50]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/36]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Aussenspiegel für Kraftfahrzeuge[2002/50]
English:External mirror for lorries[2002/50]
French:Rétroviseur extérieur pour camions[2002/50]
Examination procedure12.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/23]
21.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
23.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2335898  (MCANDREW JOHN [IE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 27; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]DE3044614  (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph L; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE4204053  (LEWIS BERNARD [ZA], et al) [Y] 9 * column 5, line 50 - line 61; figure 8 *