Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1267097

EP1267097 - Sandwich-molded guide for transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tsubakimoto Chain Co.
Osaka Fukokuseimei Building, 2-4, Komatsubara-cho, Kita-ku
Osaka 530-0018 / JP
For all designated states
I & P Co., Ltd
1050-1, Takasaka Higashimatsuyama-shi
Saitama 355-0047 / JP
For all designated states
Tsubakimoto Kogyo Co., Ltd.
Yasudalife Osaka Bldg., 3-20, Umeda 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka 530-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
Tsubakimoto Chain Co.
Osaka Fukokuseimei Building, 2-4, Komatsubara-cho, Kita-ku
Osaka 530-0018 / JP
For all designated states
I & P Co., Ltd
1050-1, Takasaka
Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitama 355-0047 / JP
For all designated states
Tsubakimoto Kogyo Co., Ltd.
Yasudalife Osaka Bldg., 3-20, Umeda 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka 530-0001 / JP
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Tsubakimoto Chain Co.
Osaka Fukokuseimei Building, 2-4, Komatsubara-cho, Kita-Ku
Osaka 530-0018 / JP
For all designated states
I & P Co., Ltd
1050-1, Takasaka
Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitma 355-0047 / JP
For all designated states
Tsubakimoto Kogyo Co., Ltd.
Yasudalife Osaka Bldg., 3-20, Umeda 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka 530-0001 / JP
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
Tsubakimoto Chain Co.
Twin 21 MID Tower 36Fl, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
For all designated states
I & P Co., Ltd
1050-1, Takasaka
Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitma 355-0047 / JP
For all designated states
Tsubakimoto Kogyo Co., Ltd.
Yasudalife Osaka Bldg., 3-20, Umeda 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka 530-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Kozo
Osaka Fukokuseimei Bldg, 2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-Ku Osaka 530-0018 / JP
02 / Ono, Osamu
Osaka Fukokuseimei Bldg, 2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-Ku Osaka 530-0018 / JP
03 / Matsumara, Shuuji
c/o I & P Co., Ltd., 1050-1, Takasaka
Higashimatsuyama, Saitama / JP
04 / Yamawaki, Koji
c/o Tsubakimoto Kogyo Co., Ltd., Yasudalife Osaka
3-20, Umeda 3-come, Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP
 [2003/38]
Former [2003/37]01 / Inoue, Kozo
Osaka Fukokuseimei Bldg, 2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-Ku Osaka 530-0018 / JP
02 / Ono, Osamu
Osaka Fukokuseimei Bldg, 2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-Ku Osaka 530-0018 / JP
03 / Matsumara, Shuuji
Osaka Fukokuseimei Bldg, 2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-Ku Osaka 530-0018 / JP
04 / Yamawaki, Koji
Osaka Fukokuseimei Bldg, 2-4 Komatsubara-cho
Kita-Ku Osaka 530-0018 / JP
Former [2002/51]01 / Inoue, Kozo
c/o Tsubakomoto Chain Co., Twin21 MID Tower, 36 Fl
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP
02 / Ono, Osamu
c/o Tsubakomoto Chain Co., Twin21 MID Tower, 36 Fl
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP
03 / Matsumara, Shuuji
c/o I & P Co., Ltd., 1050-1, Takasaka
Higashimatsuyama, Saitama / JP
04 / Yamawaki, Koji
c/o Tsubakimoto Kogyo Co., Ltd., Yasudalife Osaka
3-20, Umeda 3-come, Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held
Klopstockstrasse 63-65
70193 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held
Klopstockstrasse 63
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02012962.312.06.2002
[2002/51]
Priority number, dateJP2001017929313.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001179293
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1267097
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1267097
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16H7/18, // F16H7/08
[2002/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/37]
Former [2002/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Führungsschiene eines Getriebes hergestellt in Sandwich-Giessverfahren[2002/51]
English:Sandwich-molded guide for transmission device[2002/51]
French:Rail de guidage de transmission obtenu par procédé de moulage sandwich[2002/51]
Examination procedure19.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/16]
09.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2003Fee for grant paid
19.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0846891  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [Y] 1-22 * column 4, lines 38-40 * * column 4, lines 17-20; figure 4 *;
 [Y]DE19923905  (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [Y] 1-22 * column 3, lines 57-61; claims 1-3 * * column 2, lines 38-44 *;
 [Y]GB2351136  (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO [JP]) [Y] 1-22 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [PA]US2002050184  (SUZUKI TADASU [JP]) [PA] 1-22 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH10292855
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, [A] 1-22 * abstract *