EP1258529 - FLIP gene and FLIP protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/47] | FLIP Gene and FLIP Protein | ||
[2003/05] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apoxis SA 22, chemin des Croisettes 1066 Epalinges / CH | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Apotech S.A. 84, rue du Rhone 1204 Geneva / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tschopp, Jürg Fontannins 10 1066 Epalinges / CH | 02 /
Thome, Margot Chemin Pierre Boulanger 1083 Mézières / CH | 03 /
Burns, Kimberly Epinettes, 8 1007 Lausanne / CH | 04 /
Irmler, Martin Geisselstrasse 58 50823 Koeln / DE | 05 /
Hofmann, Kay Ehrenfeldguertel, 139 50823 Koeln / DE | 06 /
Schröter, Michael Goldentalweg, 5 4104 Oberswil / DE | 07 /
Schneider, Pascal Tuileries, 7 1066 Epalinges / CH | 08 /
Bodmer, Jean-Luc 526 Camino De. Mar, Apt 25 Del Mar, California 92014 / US | 09 /
Rochat-Steiner, Véronique La Riette 1322 Croy / CH | 10 /
Rimoldi, Donata Le Boitel 1091 Grandvaux / CH | 11 /
Hahne, Michael c/o Pradet-Balade Calle Santa Juliana, 31 BJ IZq 28039 Madrid / ES | 12 /
French, Lars, E. 41 Crêts de Champel 1206 Genève / CH | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/47] | 01 /
Tschopp, Jürg Fontannins 10 1066 Epalinges / CH | ||
02 /
Thome, Margot Chemin Pierre Boulanger 1083 Mézières / CH | |||
03 /
Burns, Kimberly Epinettes, 8 1007 Lausanne / CH | |||
04 /
Irmler, Martin Geisselstrasse 58 50823 Koeln / DE | |||
05 /
Hofmann, Kay Ehrenfeldguertel, 139 50823 Koeln / DE | |||
06 /
Schröter, Michael Goldentalweg, 5 4104 Oberswil / DE | |||
07 /
Schneider, Pascal Tuileries, 7 1066 Epalinges / CH | |||
08 /
Bodmer, Jean-Luc 526 Camino De. Mar, Apt 25 Del Mar, California 92014 / US | |||
09 /
Rochat-Steiner, Véronique La Riette 1322 Croy / CH | |||
10 /
Rimoldi, Donata Le Boitel 1091 Grandvaux / CH | |||
11 /
Hahne, Michael c/o Pradet-balade Calle Santa Juliana, 31 28039 Madrid / ES | |||
12 /
French, Lars, E. 41 Crêts de Champel 1206 Genève / CH | Representative(s) | Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Tetaz, Franck, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 129, rue Servient 69326 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2002/47] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, Dr. rer. nat., et al Bosch - Graf v. Stosch - Jehle Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013267.6 | 31.03.1998 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | DE1997113393 | 01.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19713393 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1258529 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1258529 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C12N5/10, G01N33/68, A61K38/17, A61K48/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/47] | Title | German: | FLIP-Gen und FLIP-Protein | [2002/47] | English: | FLIP gene and FLIP protein | [2003/05] | French: | FLIP gene et FLIP-proteine | [2003/05] |
Former [2002/47] | FLIP Gene and FLIP Protein | ||
Former [2002/47] | FLIP-Gène et FLIP-Protéine | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 03.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98919192.9 / EP0973901 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2004 | 31.03.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9401451 (BIONEBRASKA INC [US]) [Y] 29 * abstract *; | [E]WO9831801 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [E] 1,4,14-17,19-23,26-28,34 * abstract *; | [E]WO9833883 (TULARIK INC [US]) [E] 1,4,14-17,19-23,26-28,34 * abstract *; | [E]WO9839435 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [E] 1,4,14-17,19-23,26-28,34 * abstract *; | [XY] - BERTIN J ET AL, "Death effector domain-containing herpesvirus and poxvirus proteins inhibit both Fas- and TNFR1-induced apoptosis.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, FEB 18 1997, 94 (4) P1172-6, UNITED STATES, XP002100715 [X] 1-12,17-28,34 * abstract * * page 1174, column L, paragraph 2 - page 1176, column L, paragraph 1 * [Y] 29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.4.1172 | [X] - T G SENKEVICH ET AL, "Genome sequence of a human tumorigenic poxvirus: Prediction of specific host response evasion genes", SCIENCE, (19960809), vol. 273, pages 813 - 816, XP002087266 [X] 1-12,17-28,34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.273.5276.813 | [X] - NEIPEL F., ALBRECHT J., FLECKENSTEIN B.;, "Kaposi's sarcoma-associated herpesvirus putative apoptosis", EMVRL DATABASE , ACCESSION NUNBER U90534, (19970331), XP002113437 [X] 1,4 * the whole document * | [X] - TELFORD E.A., WATSON M.S., AIRD H.C., PERRY J., DAVISON A.J.;, "EQUINE HERPESVIRUS TYPE 2 (EHV-2). ORF8", DATABASE TRVRL , ACCESSION NUMBER Q66674, (19961101), XP002113438 [X] 1,4 * the whole document * | [X] - ALBRECHT, J., "Primary structure of the herpesvirus saimiri genome.", DATABASE PIR2,ACCESSION NUMBER E36813, (19921016), XP002113439 [X] 1,4 * the whole document * | [A] - AMICONE L ET AL, "Transgenic expression in the liver of truncated Met blocks apoptosis and permits immortalization of hepatocytes.", THE EMBO JOURNAL. ENGLAND 3 FEB 1997, (19970203), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 495 - 503, XP002222734 [A] 1,18,22,26 * page 304 - page 308 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/16.3.495 | [A] - CHIARUGI V ET AL, "Apoptosis, senescence, immortalization and cancer.", PHARMACOLOGICAL RESEARCH: THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE ITALIAN PHARMACOLOGICAL SOCIETY. ENGLAND DEC 1994, (199412), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 1043-6618, pages 301 - 315, XP001128721 [A] 1,18,22,26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1043-6618(94)80010-3 | [X] - TREMBL PROTEIN SEQUE, (19000101), Database accession no. Q98325, XP002113442 [X] 1-12,17-28,34 * the whole document * | [X] - TREMBL PROTEIN SEQUE, (19000101), Database accession no. Q98326, XP002113443 [X] 1-12,17-28,34 * the whole document * |