blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1269897

EP1269897 - Device for dispensing hot or cold water in measured volumes, especially for delivery of beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A. u. K. Müller GmbH & Co. KG
Dresdener Strasse 162
40595 Düsseldorf / DE
[2003/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Berger, Gerd
Bücherstrasse 35
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / Glaus, Uwe
Kammerathsfeldstrasse 73
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / Moldenhauer, Hermann
Lüdenscheiderstrasse 2
40625 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Feder, Wolf-Dietrich
Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder
Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka
Dominikanerstrasse 37
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date02013274.218.06.2002
[2003/01]
Priority number, dateDE200112966520.06.2001         Original published format: DE 10129665
[2003/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1269897
Date:02.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2002
ClassificationIPC:A47J31/46, A47J31/40
[2003/01]
CPC:
A47J31/402 (EP,US); A47J31/461 (EP,US); A47J31/469 (EP,US);
F04B13/00 (EP); F04B7/0076 (EP); G01F11/029 (EP);
A47J31/36 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/01]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von Kalt- oder Heisswasser in abgemessenen Portionen, insbesondere zur Herstellung von Getränken[2003/01]
English:Device for dispensing hot or cold water in measured volumes, especially for delivery of beverages[2003/01]
French:Dispositif pour distribuer de l'eau froide ou chaude en quantités prédéterminées, particulièrement pour préparer des boissons[2003/01]
Examination procedure16.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/34]
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/01]
09.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2365996  (RENEKA SA [FR]) [A] 7 * page 1, line 23 - line 29; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3102724  (MUELLER A & K GMBH CO KG [DE]);
 [A]EP0177462  (GAGGIA BREVETTI [IT]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 8; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0476173  (MIRALFIN SRL [IT]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 24 - column 7, line 20; figure 12 *;
 [X]US5284423  (HOLDSWORTH DAVID [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,11 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 34 * * column 4, line 1 - line 53; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5540562  (GITER GERSTON [US]) [A] * abstract *
by applicantEP0636333
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.