blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1270760

EP1270760 - Method for coating substrates by sputtering [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.10.2012
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.11.2012  [2012/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Matthée, Torsten, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Schöne Aussicht 4a
25582 Hohenaspe / DE
02 / Jung, Thomas
Im Kamp 14
38173 Hötzum / DE
03 / Klages, Claus-Peter, Dr.Dipl.-Chem.
Lützowstrasse 1
38102 Braunschweig / DE
04 / Thomas, Michael, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Birkenrain 6
31275 Lehrte / DE
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Former [2003/01]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02013331.018.06.2002
[2003/01]
Priority number, dateDE2001102931319.06.2001         Original published format: DE 10129313
[2003/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1270760
Date:02.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2002
ClassificationIPC:C23C14/04, C23C14/02
[2003/01]
CPC:
C23C14/022 (EP); C23C14/042 (EP); H05K3/16 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/01]
TitleGerman:Sputterverfahren zur Beschichtung von Substraten[2003/01]
English:Method for coating substrates by sputtering[2003/01]
French:Procédé pour le revêtement des substrats par pulvérisation cathodique[2003/01]
Examination procedure22.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
26.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/48]
10.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/48]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201211   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE19755902  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [AD] 1-21* the whole document *;
 [XA]WO0127969  (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [X] 14-16 * page 13, line 18 - page 15, line 22 * [A] 1-13,17-21
by applicantDE19505268
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.