Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1266818

EP1266818 - Front end structure of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/32]For all designated states
FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takeuchi, Akihide, Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
02 / Ikeda, Yoshiyuki, Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)Popp, Eugen , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Popp, Eugen, Dr. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02013458.113.06.2002
[2002/51]
Priority number, dateJP2001018204315.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001182043
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1266818
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1266818
Date:12.03.2003
[2003/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1266818
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/08
[2002/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/49]
Former [2002/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorderstruktur eines Fahrzeuges[2002/51]
English:Front end structure of a vehicle[2002/51]
French:Structure avant de véhicule[2002/51]
Examination procedure20.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/34]
13.09.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.01.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
08.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2006Fee for grant paid
08.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.10.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.08.2006
[2009/01]
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH1143071  ;
 [A]JP2000190869
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH07172345