blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1271389

EP1271389 - Fingerprint input device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2013Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.01.2014  [2014/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Personal Computers, Ltd.
11-1, Osaki 1-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0032 / JP
[2011/46]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Higuchi, Teruyuki
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2003/01]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02013534.918.06.2002
[2003/01]
Priority number, dateJP2001018342718.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001183427
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1271389
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1271389
Date:07.09.2005
[2005/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2005
ClassificationIPC:G06K9/20, G07C9/00
[2003/01]
CPC:
A61B5/1172 (EP); G06F18/00 (KR); G06V40/1324 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/21]
Former [2003/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Eingabe von Fingerabdrücken[2003/01]
English:Fingerprint input device[2003/01]
French:Dispositif d'entrée d'empreintes digitales[2003/01]
Examination procedure03.08.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
16.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2008Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/01]
18.02.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.03.2013Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/01]
Appeal following examination17.04.2008Appeal received No.  T1161/08
06.06.2008Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
21.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
26.03.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.05.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
23.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
24.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5446290  (FUJIEDA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 2,33-35 * column 3, line 6 - line 16 * * column 5, line 30 - line 41 ** abstract *;
 [XA]US5942761  (TULI RAJA SINGH [CA]) [X] 1,2,4-7,15,29,31,33-35 * abstract * * column 6, line 22 - line 44 * * column 7, line 54 - line 60 * [A] 3,8-14,16-28,30,32,36,37
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.