blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1253215

EP1253215 - PVD Al2O3 coated cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.12.2005  [2005/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[2004/51]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2002/44]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sjöstrand, Mats
Imatragatan 28
164 78 Kista / SE
02 / Ljungberg, Björn
Kulstötarvägen 96
122 44 Enskede / SE
03 / Alfredsson, Viveka
Dymlingsgränd 10
129 30 Hägersten / SE
04 / Hilding, Tomas
Nygatan 7B, 1 tr
647 30 Mariefred / SE
05 / Schiller Siegfried
Plattleite 17
01324 Dresden / DE
06 / Fietzke Fred
An der Goldenen Höhe 20
01309 Dresden / DE
07 / Zywitzki Olaf
Kyfhäuserstr.19
01309 Dresden / DE
08 / Goedicke Klaus
Pfeifferhannstr 78
01307 Dresden / DE
 [2004/50]
Former [2004/44]01 / Sjöstrand, Mats
Imatragatan 28
164 78 Kista / SE
02 / Ljungberg, Björn
Kulstötarvägen 96
122 44 Enskede / SE
03 / Alfredsson, Viveka
Dymlingsgränd 10
129 30 Hägersten / SE
04 / Hilding, Tomas
Nygatan 7B, 1 tr
647 30 Mariefred / SE
05 / Schiller Siegfried
Plattleite 17
01324 Dresden / DE
06 / Fietzke Fred
Leisniger Strasse 63
01127 Dresden / DE
07 / Zywitzki Olaf
J.-S Bach Str. 6
09599 Freiberg / DE
08 / Goedicke Klaus
Pfeifferhannstr 78
01307 Dresden / DE
Former [2004/43]01 / Sjöstrand, Mats
Imatragatan 28
164 78 Kista / SE
02 / Ljungberg, Björn
Kulstötarvägen 96
122 44 Enskede / SE
03 / Alfredsson, Viveka
Dymlingsgränd 10
129 30 Hägersten / SE
04 / Hilding, Tomas
Nygatan 7B, 1 tr
647 30 Mariefred / SE
05 / Schiller Siegfrid
Plattleite 17
01324 Dresden / DE
06 / Fietzke Fred
Leisniger Strasse 63
01127 Dresden / DE
07 / Zywitzki Olaf
J.-S Bach Str. 6
09599 Freiberg / DE
08 / Goedicke Klaus
Pfeifferhannstr 78
01307 Dresden / DE
Former [2002/49]01 / Sjöstrand, Mats
Köpenhamnsgatan 26
164 42 Kista / SE
02 / Ljungberg, Björn
Kulstötarvägen 96
122 44 Enskede / SE
03 / Alfredsson, Viveka
Dymlingsgränd 10
129 30 Hägersten / SE
04 / Hilding, Tomas
Nygatan 7B, 1 tr
647 30 Mariefred / SE
Former [2002/44]01 / Sjöstrand, Mats
Imatragatan 28
164 78 Kista / SE
02 / Ljungberg, Björn
Kulstötarvägen 96
122 44 Enskede / SE
03 / Alfredsson, Viveka
Dymlingsgränd 10
129 30 Hägersten / SE
04 / Hilding, Tomas
Nygatan 7B, 1 tr
647 30 Mariefred / SE
Representative(s)Lieke, Winfried, et al
WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Lieke, Winfried, Dr., et al
Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45
65051 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2002/44]Taquist, Lennart
AB Sandvik Central Service Patents & Licences
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Application number, filing date02013750.106.11.1998
[2002/44]
Priority number, dateSE1997000406606.11.1997         Original published format: SE 9704066
[2002/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1253215
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1253215
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1253215
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:C23C14/08
[2002/44]
CPC:
C23C14/081 (EP,KR,US); C23C14/354 (KR); C23C14/0036 (KR);
C23C14/352 (EP,US); C23C14/541 (KR); B23B2228/10 (KR);
Y10T407/27 (EP,US); Y10T428/24975 (EP,US); Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US); Y10T428/265 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2002/44]
TitleGerman:Mit PVD-Al2O3 beschichtetes Schneidwerkzeug[2002/44]
English:PVD Al2O3 coated cutting tool[2002/44]
French:Outil de coupe revêtu avec Al2O3 déposé par PVD[2002/44]
Examination procedure26.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/46]
24.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2004Fee for grant paid
30.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98954899.5  / EP1029105
Opposition(s)30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
31.07.2003M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0744473  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-8* column 6, line 18 - line 26; claims 1,4 *;
 [X]  - ZYWITZKI O ET AL, "EFFECT OF THE SUBSTRATE TEMPERATURE ON THE STRUCTURE AND PROPERTIESOF A12O3 LAYERS REACTIVELY DEPOSITED BY PULSED MAGNETRON SPUTTERING", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 82, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 169 - 175, XP000917184 [X] 1-8 * page 170 - page 173 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0257-8972(95)00270-7
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.