Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1249893

EP1249893 - Broadband antenna using semicircular radiator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.11.2005  [2005/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC.
10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8436 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]For all designated states
NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC.
10-1, Toranomon 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8436 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ihara, Taisuke c/o Intellectual Prop. Dept.
NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho
2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
02 / Tsunekawa, Koichi c/o Intellectual Prop. Dept.
NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho
2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
03 / Kijima, Makoto
3-13-4, Shiomidai
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
 [2002/51]
Former [2002/42]01 / Ihara, Taisuke
4-27-3, Shounantakatori
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Tsunekawa, Koichi
Nagasawa Daiichi Shataku 2-5-208, 94, Nagasawa
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Kijima, Makoto
3-13-4, Shiomidai
Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date02013954.919.09.1996
[2002/42]
Priority number, dateJP1995024971227.09.1995         Original published format: JP 24971295
JP1995032190611.12.1995         Original published format: JP 32190695
[2002/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1249893
Date:16.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1249893
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1249893
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01Q9/40, H01Q9/28
[2003/26]
Former International [2002/42]H01Q9/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/42]
TitleGerman:Breitbandige Antenne mit einem halbkreisförmigen Stahler[2002/42]
English:Broadband antenna using semicircular radiator[2002/42]
French:Antenne à large bande avec une source semi-circulaire[2002/42]
Examination procedure25.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/42]
30.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2004Fee for grant paid
13.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96115061.2  / EP0766343
Opposition(s)02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]US4443805  (HAVOT HENRI A P [FR]) [A] 3,5 * abstract *;
 [A]US3364491  (WALTER STOHR) [A] 1,3 * figures 1-6; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]DE1301376  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]JPS57142003  ;
 [A]JPS60237701  ;
 [A]EP0565051  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821202), vol. 6, no. 243, Database accession no. (E - 145)<1121> , [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860412), vol. 10, no. 95, Database accession no. (E - 395)<2152> , [A] 3 * abstract *