blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1273990

EP1273990 - Operation lever apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.04.2009  [2009/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2008/19]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2003/02]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirata, Minoru
3-29-18, Nakagawa, Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Matsuoka, Kazuko
2-19-37, Higashiterao, Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
 [2003/02]
Representative(s)Balsters, Robert, et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Balsters, Robert, et al
Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date02014098.402.07.2002
[2003/02]
Priority number, dateJP2001020272303.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001202723
JP2002019178301.07.2002         Original published format: JP 2002191783
[2003/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1273990
Date:08.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1273990
Date:29.03.2006
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1273990
Date:07.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2006
ClassificationIPC:G05G9/047
[2003/02]
CPC:
G05G9/04788 (EP,US); G05G9/047 (EP,US); G05G2009/04774 (EP,US);
G05G2009/04777 (EP,US); G05G2009/04781 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/49]
Former [2003/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betätigungshebelvorrichtung[2003/02]
English:Operation lever apparatus[2003/02]
French:Dispositif de poignée de commande[2003/02]
Examination procedure17.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/27]
07.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2008Fee for grant paid
20.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
19.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4414438  (MAIER BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 3, lines 55-63; figure . *;
 [A]US4558609  (KIM SYNG N [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [XY]US4748441  (BRZEZINSKI STEPHEN R M [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document * [Y] 3,11-18;
 [A]US5252821  (SUGIMURA MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 11 *;
 [Y]US5949404  (ZABEL KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 11-18* the whole document *;
 [EX]US6580418  (GROME DONALD C [US], et al) [EX] 1-10 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.