Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1276089

EP1276089 - Label for labelling of preferably cylindrical containers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schreiner GmbH & Co. KG
Bruckmannring 22
85764 Oberschleissheim / DE
[2003/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Seidl, Peter
Danklstrasse 28
81371 München / DE
 [2003/03]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Postfach 20 07 34
80007 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/50]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34
80007 München / DE
Former [2003/03]Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date02014183.425.06.2002
[2003/03]
Priority number, dateUS2001090156511.07.2001         Original published format: US 901565
[2003/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1276089
Date:15.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1276089
Date:03.12.2003
[2003/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1276089
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:G09F3/02, G03B21/00, G09F3/10
[2003/49]
Former International [2003/03]G09F3/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/03]
TitleGerman:Etikett zum Etikettieren von vorzugsweise zylindrischen Behältnissen[2003/03]
English:Label for labelling of preferably cylindrical containers[2003/03]
French:Etiquette pour etiqueter des récipients de préférence cylindriques[2003/03]
Examination procedure29.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/01]
14.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2009Fee for grant paid
11.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
19.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.03.2009
CY25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
TR25.03.2009
LU25.06.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT31.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
LU25.06.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/47]BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/08]BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/07]BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2009/49]BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2009/43]BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
Former [2009/37]FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0463193  (SCHREINER ETIKETTEN) [DA] 1-30 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [DA]US6193279  (SEIDL PETER) [DA] 1-30 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0129804  (SEIDL PETER ;SCHREINER GMBH & CO KG (DE)) [A] 1-3,17 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2310418  (JARVIS PORTER GROUP PLC) [A] 1,17 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *