Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP1279620


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.12.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2008  [2008/03]
17.08.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2007  [2007/38]
25.05.2007 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  27.06.2007  [2007/26]
13.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2007  [2007/20]
02.02.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2007  [2007/10]
24.11.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2006  [2006/52]
04.08.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
07.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2006  [2006/32]
09.06.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2006  [2006/28]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
14.10.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2005  [2005/48]
30.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
09.09.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.10.2005  [2005/43]
10.06.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.07.2005  [2005/30]
20.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2005  [2005/27]
13.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.06.2005  [2005/26]
29.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
17.09.2004 (Expected) grant published on  03.11.2004  [2004/45]
06.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.03.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.12.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
30.12.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
29.08.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  15.10.2003  [2003/42]
16.05.2003 Request for examination filed published on  02.07.2003  [2003/27]
15.02.2003 Change - applicant published on  02.04.2003  [2003/14]
13.12.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.01.2003  [2003/05]