Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1386985

EP1386985 - Process for electrolytic polishing of dental instruments made of nickel-titanium alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maillefer Instruments Holding S.À.R.L.
1338 Ballaigues / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]For all designated states
Maillefer Instruments Holding S.À.R.L.
1338 Ballaigues / CH
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
Maillefer Instruments Holding S.A.R.L.
1338 Ballaigues / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Kempf, Bertrand
Chemin du Verger 3
1338 Ballaigues / FR
02 / Aeby, François
Chemin des Haies 4
1442 Montagny-Pres-Yverdon / CH
 [2004/06]
Representative(s)Micheli & Cie SA
Rue de Genève 122
Case Postale 61
1226 Genève-Thônex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2004/06]Micheli & Cie
122, rue de Genève, CP 61
1226 Thonex-Genève / CH
Application number, filing date02015895.217.07.2002
[2004/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1386985
Date:04.02.2004
Language:FR
[2004/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1386985
Date:20.08.2008
Language:FR
[2008/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:C25F3/16
[2004/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum elektrolytischen Polieren von zahnärztlichen Instrumenten aus Nickel-Titan Legierungen[2004/06]
English:Process for electrolytic polishing of dental instruments made of nickel-titanium alloys[2004/06]
French:Procédé de polissage électrolytique pour des instruments dentaires en alliage de nickel-titane[2004/06]
Examination procedure10.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/20]
12.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2008Fee for grant paid
05.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.05.2009  27.05.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Tital Holding SA
Rue Galilée 4
Y-Parc
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH
Opponent's representative
Scheuzger, Beat Otto
Bovard AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2012/52]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.2009  27.05.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Tital Holding SA
Rue Galilée 4
Y-Parc
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH
Opponent's representative
Scheuzger, Beat Otto
Bovard AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
Former [2009/26]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.2009   
Titanium Engineering Sa
Rue Galilée 15 Y-Parc
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH
Opponent's representative
Scheuzger, Beat Otto
Bovard SA, Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
26.06.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.10.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2012Date of oral proceedings
03.01.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.01.2013Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
17.05.2014Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/31]
Appeal following opposition07.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0316/13
07.05.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
07.05.2014Date of oral proceedings
16.05.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
19.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.08.2008
CY20.08.2008
CZ20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
EE20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
SK20.08.2008
TR20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
GR21.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
PT20.01.2009
LU17.07.2009
BE31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/21]AT20.08.2008
CZ20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
EE20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
SK20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
GR21.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
PT20.01.2009
LU17.07.2009
BE31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/47]AT20.08.2008
CZ20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
EE20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
SK20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
GR21.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
PT20.01.2009
BE31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/29]AT20.08.2008
CZ20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
EE20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
SK20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
PT20.01.2009
BE31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/11]AT20.08.2008
CZ20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
EE20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
SK20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
PT20.01.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2009/36]AT20.08.2008
CZ20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
EE20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
SK20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
PT20.01.2009
Former [2009/25]AT20.08.2008
CZ20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
SK20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
PT20.01.2009
Former [2009/24]AT20.08.2008
CZ20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
SK20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
Former [2009/23]AT20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
IE20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
BG20.11.2008
ES01.12.2008
Former [2009/20]AT20.08.2008
DK20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
ES01.12.2008
Former [2009/16]AT20.08.2008
NL20.08.2008
ES01.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL20.08.2008
ES01.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]US6375826  (WANG JINGLI ET AL) [X] 1-6 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 21 *;
 [A]WO0106954  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM) [A] 1-6 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 19 *;
 [A]DE10037337  (NMI NATURWISSENSCHAFTLICHES UN) [A] 1 * claims 1,6 *;
 [DA]  - PIOTROWSKI O ET AL, "ELECTROPOLISHING OF TITANIUM AND TITANIUM ALLOYS IN PERCHLORATE- FREE ELECTROLYTES", PLATING AND SURFACE FINISHING, AMERICAN ELECTROPLATERS SOCIETY,INC. EAST ORANGE, US, (19980501), vol. 85, no. 5, ISSN 0360-3164, pages 115 - 119, XP000765211