Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1386985 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1386985



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 756
04.03.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
03.12.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
04.06.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.06.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.05.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.05.2014 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 11
21.05.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.05.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.05.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
18.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.12.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.12.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
29.11.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.11.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2013 Request for re-establishment of rights Appeal 5
28.10.2013 Request for re-establishment of rights Appeal 5
27.08.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
27.08.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
29.07.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
26.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.07.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
25.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.07.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
22.07.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
04.06.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.05.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.05.2013 F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds Appeal 1
21.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
14.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
29.04.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
11.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
08.02.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
03.01.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
03.01.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
03.01.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.01.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.12.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
26.11.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
21.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 2
16.11.2012 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 1
13.11.2012 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Claims Opposition 1
13.11.2012 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Claims Opposition 1
13.11.2012 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Claims Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Description Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Description Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Description Opposition 3
13.11.2012 Description Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Description Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Description Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Description Opposition 2
13.11.2012 Description Opposition 3
13.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2012 Claims Opposition 2
05.11.2012 Claims Opposition 4
05.11.2012 Claims Opposition 2
05.11.2012 Claims Opposition 5
05.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
02.11.2012 Claims Opposition 10
02.11.2012 Claims Opposition 8
02.11.2012 Claims Opposition 7
02.11.2012 Claims Opposition 7
02.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
24.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.05.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.05.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
09.02.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
07.07.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.07.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
05.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
15.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Opposition 1
05.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
28.10.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.10.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
26.06.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.06.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
04.06.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 185
18.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
18.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
18.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
18.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.05.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
15.05.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.05.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
24.07.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.07.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
05.07.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.07.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
19.05.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.05.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
19.05.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.05.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
11.08.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.08.2006 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.08.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.04.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.04.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.03.2004 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.02.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.12.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
17.07.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.07.2002 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
17.07.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
17.07.2002 Description Search / examination 6
17.07.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6