Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255209

EP1255209 - Apparatus and method for automated protein design [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
1200 East California Boulevard
Mail Code 210-85
Pasadena, CA 91125 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
California Institute of Technology
1200 East California Boulevard, Mail Code 210-85
Pasadena, CA 91125 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mayo, Stephen
530 S. Greenwood Avenue
Pasadena, CA 91107 / US
02 / Dahiyat, Bassil I.
10933 Rochester Avenue, 409
Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US
03 / Gordon, Benjamin D.
442 S. Catalina 103
Pasadena, CA 91106 / US
04 / Street, Arthur
4602 Greenwood Place, 7
Los Angeles, CA 90027 / US
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date02015990.110.04.1998
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateUS19970043464P11.04.1997         Original published format: US 43464 P
US19970054678P04.08.1997         Original published format: US 54678 P
US19970061097P03.10.1997         Original published format: US 61097 P
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255209
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1255209
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, G06F17/50, C07K1/00
[2009/07]
Former International [2002/45]G06F17/50, C07K1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/45]
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren für automatischen Protein-Entwurf[2002/45]
English:Apparatus and method for automated protein design[2002/45]
French:Dispositif et méthode permettant une mise au point informatisée de protéines[2002/45]
Examination procedure06.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
17.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/06]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98915478.6  / EP0974111
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
26.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200912   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XD]  DAHIYAT B I ET AL, "PROTEIN DESIGN AUTOMATION", PROTEIN SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19960501), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 895 - 903, XP002073372 [XD] 1-22 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * page 896, column L, line 40 - page 897, column R, line 6 * * figure 3 *
 [A]  SUN SHAOJIAN ET AL, "Designing amino acid sequences to fold with good hydrophobic cores", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1995), vol. 8, no. 12, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 1205 - 1213, XP008100093 [A] 5,6 * page 1205, column R, line 50 - page 1206, column L, line 18 *
 [PX]  DAHIYAT B I ET AL, "De Novo protein design: towards fully automated sequence selection", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (19971107), vol. 273, no. 4, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 789 - 796, XP004461373 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 789, column R, line 3 - page 790, column R, line 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1997.1341
 [PX]  DAHIYAT B I ET AL, "De novo protein design: fully automated sequence selection", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, WASHINGTON, DC, (19971003), vol. 278, no. 5335, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 82 - 87, XP002188179 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 82, column L, line 1 - column R, line 21 * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.278.5335.82