blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1293946

EP1293946 - Portable gas alarm device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 28.03.2007  [2007/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RIKEN KEIKI CO., LTD.
7-6, Azusawa 2-chome, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174 / JP
[2003/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Koyano, Junichi
Riken Keiki Co., Ltd., 2-7-6 Azusawa
Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8744 / JP
02 / Tajima, Shuji
Riken Keiki Co., Ltd., 2-7-6 Azusawa
Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8744 / JP
03 / Ao, Yoshiharu
Riken Keiki Co., Ltd., 2-7-6 Azusawa
Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8744 / JP
04 / Kitamura, Masahide
Riken Keiki Co., Ltd., 2-7-6 Azusawa
Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8744 / JP
 [2003/12]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02016213.718.07.2002
[2003/12]
Priority number, dateJP2001028195317.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001281953
[2003/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1293946
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1293946
Date:17.09.2003
[2003/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1293946
Date:22.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:G08B21/14, G01N33/00
[2003/38]
CPC:
G08B21/14 (EP,US); G08B21/16 (KR)
Former IPC [2003/12]G08B21/14
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2004/24]
Former [2003/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tragbare Gasalarmvorrichtung[2003/12]
English:Portable gas alarm device[2003/12]
French:Appareil d' alarme à gaz portable[2003/12]
Examination procedure09.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/19]
05.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2005Fee for grant paid
02.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE22.02.2006
SE22.05.2006
[2007/13]
Former [2006/46]SE22.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29601472U  (W O M GMBH INNOVATIVE PRODUKTE [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 29 - line 36 * * page 6, line 20 - line 23 ** figure 1 *;
 [XA]GB2331363  (RIKEN KEIKI KK [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 5 * [A] 2-9
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.