Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317938

EP1317938 - Retractable needle single use safety syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mahurkar, Sakharam D.
6171 N. Sheridan Road
Suite 1112
Chicago
IL 60660 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/28]For all designated states
Mahurkar, Sakharam D.
6171 N. Sheridan Road, Suite 1112 Chicago
IL 60660 / US
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Mahurkar, Sakharam D.
6171 N. Sheridan Road, Suite 1112
Chicago, IL 60660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02016512.223.07.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateUS20010333721P28.11.2001         Original published format: US 333721 P
US2002005114022.01.2002         Original published format: US 51140
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317938
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317938
Date:12.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/32
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Einwegsicherheitsspritze mit einer einziehbaren Nadel[2003/24]
English:Retractable needle single use safety syringe[2003/24]
French:Seringue de sécurité à usage unique à aiguille retractable[2003/24]
Examination procedure09.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
18.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2006Fee for grant paid
22.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06014407.8  / EP1704888
Opposition(s)13.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CY12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
EE12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
FR12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
TR12.07.2006
LU23.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
GR13.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/52]AT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
EE12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
FR12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
TR12.07.2006
LU23.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
GR13.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2008/38]AT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
EE12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
TR12.07.2006
LU23.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
FR31.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
GR13.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2008/37]AT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
EE12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
TR12.07.2006
LU23.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
GR13.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2008/28]AT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
EE12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
GR13.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2008/20]AT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
GR13.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/45]AT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/38]AT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
IT12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/28]AT12.07.2006
BE12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
SK12.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/25]AT12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
IE24.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/23]AT12.07.2006
CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/22]CH12.07.2006
CZ12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
DK12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/19]CH12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
NL12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/12]CH12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
BG12.10.2006
SE12.10.2006
ES23.10.2006
PT12.12.2006
Former [2007/10]CH12.07.2006
FI12.07.2006
LI12.07.2006
SE12.10.2006
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
Examination EP0998953
  US5267961