Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1279480

EP1279480 - Apparatus for creating three-dimensional objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2007
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Next Factory S.R.L.
Via Lago di Garda, 128/130
36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/05]For all designated states
NEXT FACTORY S.R.L.
Via Lago di Levico 3
36010 Zane'(Vicenza) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Gotoh, Hikaru c/o Autostrade Co Ltd
13-54, Ueno-machi
Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP
02 / Yano, Yasuharu c/o Autostrade Co Ltd
13-54, Ueno-machi
Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP
03 / Akamine, Toshiyuki
13-54, Ueno-machi
Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP
 [2003/05]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2004/14]
Former [2003/05]Forattini, Amelia , et al
c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date02016746.626.07.2002
[2003/05]
Priority number, dateJP2001026241227.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001262412
JP20020003806U20.05.2002         Original published format: JP 2002003806 U
[2003/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1279480
Date:29.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B29C67/00
[2003/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/05]
Extension statesAL28.07.2003
LT28.07.2003
LV28.07.2003
MK28.07.2003
RO28.07.2003
SI28.07.2003
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von dreidimensionalen Gegenständen[2003/05]
English:Apparatus for creating three-dimensional objects[2003/05]
French:Dispositif pour la production d'objets tridimensionnels[2003/05]
Examination procedure28.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
12.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/36]
12.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/36]
Request for further processing for:02.09.2004Request for further processing filed
03.08.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.09.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH06226869  (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0019] - [0032]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 5,6,8;
 [Y]US6264873  (ALLEN KERRY J ET AL) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 66 - line 67 * * column 14, line 36 - line 41 *;
 [Y]EP0436760  (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG) [Y] 5,8 * column 7, line 20 - column 8, line 17 * * column 8, line 43 - line 55; figures 3-5,9 * * column 10, line 39 - column 11, line 24; figures 11-14 *;
 [A]US5340433  (CRUMP S SCOTT) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 9 * * column 6, line 55 - line 68; figure 1 *