blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1387293

EP1387293 - Data structure manipulation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Janssen, Ocke
Stellinger Weg 30
20255 Hamburg / DE
 [2004/06]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/06]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date02016948.801.08.2002
[2004/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1387293
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2003
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/30
[2004/06]
CPC:
G06F16/284 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/44]
Former [2004/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System zum Manipulieren von Datenstrukturen[2004/06]
English:Data structure manipulation system[2004/06]
French:Système de manipulation de structure de données[2004/06]
Examination procedure05.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/22]
07.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/22]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.09.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.09.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0657829  (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,19-26,28,29,31,32,43-45,48-58 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 45 * * column 6, line 39 - column 8, line 23 *;
 [A]US5950190  (YEAGER CAROLYN MARIE [US], et al) [A] 1-58 * abstract * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 47 * * column 12, line 61 - column 14, line 14 * * column 19, line 16 - column 20, line 17 *;
 [A]  - "CHANGE DATABASE DEFINITIONS AUTIMATICALLY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19940901), vol. 37, no. 9, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 679 - 680, XP000475543 [A] 1-58 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.