Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256842

EP1256842 - Film rewinder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD.
579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi
Wakayama / JP
[2006/17]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD.
579-1 Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamaguchi, Takuji
c/o Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd., 579-1, Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02017403.321.10.1996
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateJP1995027414123.10.1995         Original published format: JP 27414195
JP1995027560224.10.1995         Original published format: JP 27560295
JP1995027553424.10.1995         Original published format: JP 27553495
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256842
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256842
Date:10.11.2004
[2004/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256842
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:G03D13/00
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/30]
Former [2002/46]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI 
TitleGerman:Filmrückspulvorrichtung[2002/46]
English:Film rewinder[2002/46]
French:Dispositif de rembobinage de film[2002/46]
Examination procedure14.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/06]
23.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.06.2005Fee for grant paid
16.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.09.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, IT
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96116874.7  / EP0770918
Opposition(s)29.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.06.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB21.10.2006
FR31.10.2006
[2008/23]
Former [2007/50]GB21.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0628873  (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PA]JPH07281393  ;
 [A]JPS61240242
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, [PA] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870317), vol. 0110, no. 87, Database accession no. (P - 557), [A] 1 * abstract *