Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1283482

EP1283482 - Methods and systems for transitioning between thumbnails and documents based upon thumbnail appearance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Database last updated on 23.09.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.2012  [2012/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Patent Department
Xerox Square - 20 A
100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, NY 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/07]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rosenholtz, Ruth E.
980 Alice Lane 2
Menio Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / Woodruff, Allison G.
969 G Edgewater Blvd, 272
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
03 / Faulring, Andrew
1002 Flemington Street
Pittsburg, PA 15217 / US
[2003/07]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/41]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2003/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02017747.308.08.2002
[2003/07]
Priority number, dateUS2001068223108.08.2001         Original published format: US 682231
[2003/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1283482
Date:12.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1283482
Date:29.03.2006
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1283482
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F3/03
[2006/13]
Former International [2003/07]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/49]
Former [2003/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Systeme zum Übergang zwischen verkleinerten Darstellungen und Dokumente basierend auf den verkleinerten Darstellungen[2003/07]
English:Methods and systems for transitioning between thumbnails and documents based upon thumbnail appearance[2003/07]
French:Procédés et systèmes pour faire la transition entre des miniatures et des documents basés sur l'apparence des miniatures[2011/07]
Former [2003/07]Procédés et Systèmes pour faire la transition entre des "ongles du pouce" et documents basés sur l'apparition des "ongles du pouce"
Examination procedure29.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/46]
22.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
13.12.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2011Fee for grant paid
22.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10012989.9  / EP2293204
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2007
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9205655  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [XA]US6160553  (ROBERTSON GEORGE G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 21, line 53 - column 22, line 21 * [A] 4;
 [Y]  WOODRUFF A ET AL ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, "USING THUMBNAILS TO SEARCH THE WEB", CHI 2001 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS. SEATTLE, WA, MARCH 31 - APRIL 5, 2001, CHI CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010331), ISBN 1-58113-327-8, pages 198 - 205, XP001090375 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/365024.365098
 [Y]  SEITZ S M ET AL, "VIEW MORPHING", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS 1996 (SIGGRAPH). NEW ORLEANS, AUG. 4 - 9, 1996, COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS (SIGGRAPH), NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (19960804), pages 21 - 30, XP000682718 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *
Examination   US6271840 B1 20010807
by applicant   WO9205655 A1 19920402
    US6271840 B1 20010807
    WOODRUFF A ET AL., "Using thumbnails to search the web", CHI 2001 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, SEATTLE, WA, MARCH 31-APRIL 5, 2001, CHI CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, NEW YORK: IEEE, US, (20010331), pages 198 - 205,
    SEITZ S M ET AL., "View Morphing", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS 1996 (SIGGRAPH), NEW ORLEANS, AUG. 4-9, 1996, COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS (SIGGRAPH), NEW YORK, NY:ACM, US, (19960804), pages 21 - 30,